Financial history HOLD IT DOWN LIMITED

Charity number: 1135191
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £59.67k £85.64k £94.30k £74.08k £65.75k
Total expenditure £69.03k £87.95k £94.96k £72.89k £63.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0