Accounts and annual returns COTTINGHAM CHURCHES TOGETHER SCHOOLS TRUST

Charity number: 1137341
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2018 14 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 11 April 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 16 June 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required