Financial history WARDEN BAY PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1140152
Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £91.17k £80.10k £90.83k £102.44k £84.58k
Total expenditure £97.33k £84.38k £76.55k £96.88k £91.94k
Income from government contracts N/A £74.11k £82.13k £92.35k £77.70k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A