Trustees WARDEN BAY PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1140152
Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Webster Chair 04 November 2020
None on record
Jade Holland Trustee 09 October 2023
None on record
Teresa Nicholls Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
Lisa Underdown Trustee 04 December 2020
None on record
Nina Shaw Trustee 29 October 2020
None on record
Bernyce Everritt Trustee 13 November 2017
None on record
Danielle Jiggens Trustee 01 April 2016
None on record