Financial history BIRMINGHAM CHILD CONTACT CENTRE

Charity number: 1141692
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2012 05/04/2013 05/04/2014 05/04/2015 05/04/2016
Total gross income £4.78k £9.87k £12.58k £26.41k £24.25k
Total expenditure £4.55k £6.00k £12.06k £19.25k £25.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0