Financial history HANFIA GHOUSIA MASJID

Charity number: 1142200
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £341.95k £200.48k £239.59k £236.58k £194.86k
Total expenditure £111.91k £93.88k £86.43k £99.62k £117.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.01k £1.48k N/A N/A N/A