Accounts and annual returns SRI LANKA ISLAMIC FORUM TRUST UK (SLIF UK TRUST)

Charity number: 1140640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2023 23 December 2024 328 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2022 23 December 2024 693 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2021 01 April 2022 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2020 24 March 2022 418 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2020 Not Required