Financial history RELIEVE AND CARE

Charity number: 1139293
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 22/07/2017 22/07/2018 22/07/2019 22/07/2020 22/07/2021
Total gross income £6.02k £1.80k £3.75k £828 £884
Total expenditure £5.76k £3.67k £3.51k £821 £847
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A