Accounts and annual returns MALHAMDALE AGRICULTURAL AND HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 501407
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2013 16 September 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 02 October 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2012 04 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 04 October 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2011 21 October 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 21 October 2012 On Time