Financial history MALHAMDALE AGRICULTURAL AND HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 501407
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013
Total gross income £36.41k £35.20k £31.53k £35.64k £36.41k
Total expenditure £75.59k £34.88k £34.38k £33.69k £33.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A