Financial history EMDR ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1140865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £343.34k £421.53k £510.32k £560.80k £712.73k
Total expenditure £248.97k £254.59k £324.22k £405.30k £579.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £509.36k £526.92k £694.86k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £15 £389 £3.81k
Income - Other N/A N/A £950 £33.49k £14.06k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £324.22k £405.30k £579.85k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £1.80k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £25.01k £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0