Accounts and annual returns Gorleston Pavilion Trust Ltd

Charity number: 1142375
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 31 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 06 October 2022 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 06 October 2022 128 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 30 July 2021 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 30 July 2021 60 days late Download Open in new window