Financial history BEDONWELL JUNIOR SCHOOL PFA

Charity number: 1140261
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 09/09/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £7.80k £20.61k £9.80k £14.16k £11.44k
Total expenditure £2.28k £12.92k £3.27k £7.72k £4.22k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A