Accounts and annual returns TRUE VINE INTERNATIONAL MINISTRY

Charity number: 1141519
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 29 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 April 2025 180 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 December 2023 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 04 December 2023 34 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 December 2021 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required