Financial history TRUE VINE INTERNATIONAL MINISTRY

Charity number: 1141519
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £12.09k £19.31k £29.89k £18.69k £23.04k
Total expenditure £25.61k £19.59k £31.17k £19.56k £18.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A