Accounts and annual returns BOURNES GREEN JUNIOR SCHOOL PRIVATE SCHOOL FUND
Charity number: 1143386

Charity reporting is overdue by 1428 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 698 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 698 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1063 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1063 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1428 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1428 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 November 2020 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 26 November 2020 | 149 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window