Accounts and annual returns MEDIC TRANSPORT

Charity Number: 1143022
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 May 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 03 May 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 03 May 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 03 May 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 03 May 2017 08 April 2018 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 03 May 2016 18 April 2017 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 May 2016 Not Required