Financial history MEDIC TRANSPORT

Charity number: 1143022
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 03/05/2013 03/05/2014 03/05/2015 03/05/2016 03/05/2017
Total gross income £4.96k £4.43k £479 £0 £0
Total expenditure £3.27k £4.21k £344 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0