Accounts and annual returns BUXTED COMMUNITY HALL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1142116
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2018 26 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 26 October 2018 On Time
Annual return 30 April 2017 29 August 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required