Financial history BUXTED COMMUNITY HALL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1142116
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2014 30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018
Total gross income £283 £6.26k £11.48k £7.10k £58.54k
Total expenditure £146 £1.29k £933 £6.15k £56.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A £0