Financial history SPEAKING PROMOTING AND INVOLVING CHILDREN IN ENGLISH

Charity Number: 1143962
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.55k £2.53k £300 £1.27k £155
Total expenditure £4.42k £96 £137 £3.98k £51
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A