Trustees PORT TALBOT MUSICAL THEATRE
Charity Number: 502281

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JESSICA LEWIS | Chair | 27 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Brimfield | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Williams | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
sarah elizabeth jones | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Edwards | Trustee | 27 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Martin Lewis | Trustee | 27 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
EMMA DAVIES | Trustee | 28 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE DYER | Trustee | 29 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
LISA DYER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LEIGHTON JOSEPH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VENNA PARMINTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GAYNOR WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELEN JOHN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MEYRICK SHEEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RHIANNON EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.