Accounts and annual returns ST VINCENT DE PAUL CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1145260
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 21 April 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 08 July 2017 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2015 13 December 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2014 22 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 Not Required