Financial history ST VINCENT DE PAUL CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1145260
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £5.01k £3.92k £4.13k £1.82k £1.68k
Total expenditure £6.47k £3.73k £3.73k £2.77k £1.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A