Accounts and annual returns HERNE BAY YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1146585
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 13 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 13 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 28 November 2024 242 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 28 November 2024 242 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 21 April 2023 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 21 April 2023 21 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 18 October 2022 201 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 18 October 2022 201 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 18 October 2022 566 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 18 October 2022 566 days late Download Open in new window