Accounts and annual returns THE CROSSWAY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1145522
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 November 2018 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 27 September 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2015 03 August 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 03 August 2016 On Time