Financial history THE CROSSWAY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1145522
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £228.19k £306.82k £281.10k £252.73k £10.00k
Total expenditure £197.09k £273.77k £264.81k £239.21k £32.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A