Accounts and annual returns THE MONKEY BAY FUND

Charity number: 1146490
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2017 19 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2016 09 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2016 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2015 23 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2015 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2014 24 June 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2014 Not Required