Financial history THE MONKEY BAY FUND

Charity number: 1146490
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2013 01/04/2014 01/04/2015 01/04/2016 01/04/2017
Total gross income £16.27k £11.73k £10.69k £8.89k £10.45k
Total expenditure £8.18k £11.92k £8.78k £9.20k £9.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A £0