Accounts and annual returns RCCG CITY OF FAITH

Charity Number: 1148819
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2024 03 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2024 03 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2023 24 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 24 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 03 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 03 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 15 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 30 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 30 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window