Financial history HARROGATE AND RIPON BEEKEEPERS' ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 502757
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £31.45k £28.52k £23.73k £22.93k £27.07k
Total expenditure £25.19k £19.80k £15.64k £26.05k £29.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A