Trustees HARROGATE AND RIPON BEEKEEPERS' ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 502757

Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon Gudgeon | Chair | 15 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Kent | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Bowen | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Binks | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Jon Treetops | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Anton Wayne Bennett | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Bond | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Bond | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Brading | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.