Accounts and annual returns FAITH AND LIFE

Charity number: 1149974
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 14 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 14 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 01 October 2024 306 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 01 October 2024 306 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 17 February 2023 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 30 November 2023 365 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 13 April 2022 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 13 April 2022 134 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 11 February 2022 438 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 13 April 2022 499 days late Download Open in new window