Financial history HARBOUR CHALLENGE OEC LIMITED

Charity number: 1148647
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2013 30/09/2014 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017
Total gross income £202.27k £317.50k £335.97k £340.48k £413.34k
Total expenditure £142.80k £232.34k £327.05k £395.07k £416.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £4.50k £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0