Accounts and annual returns HAVANT U3A

Charity Number: 1151725
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2020 10 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 17 July 2020 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 20 February 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required