Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ROTHERFIELD PSA

Charity Number: 1151767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 February 2025 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 September 2024 219 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 March 2023 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2023 359 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required