Accounts and annual returns THE DINNINGTON MINERS WELFARE AND CLOTHING SCHEME

Charity Number: 503709
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 26 April 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 26 April 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 27 October 2017 361 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 24 May 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required