Financial history THE DINNINGTON MINERS WELFARE AND CLOTHING SCHEME

Charity Number: 503709
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016
Total gross income £1.97k £2.00k £1.84k £1.79k £1.61k
Total expenditure £1.68k £1.29k £1.62k £1.77k £200
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A