Accounts and annual returns MOULTON AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 503783
Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 September 2023 236 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 February 2022 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 March 2021 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required