Financial history MOULTON AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 503783
Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £317 £353 £460 £123 £685
Total expenditure £187 £260 £212 £18 £362
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A