Financial history THE FRIENDS OF DEBDALE PARK

Charity number: 1154238
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.75k £2.75k £11.21k £19.82k £1.59k
Total expenditure £9.90k £1.20k £11.89k £15.82k £5.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.15k £1.00k £7.30k £1.60k £1.59k