Trustees THE FRIENDS OF DEBDALE PARK
Charity Number: 1154238
Up to date (43 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALLAN GRAFTON JP, MBE | Chair | 08 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Irene Hargreaves | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Norton | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Rees | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chris Kennedy | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Kirkham | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marion Ballard | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Doreen Grafton | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fred Taylor | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Olwyn Taylor | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kim Stevenson | Trustee | 12 November 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.