Trustees GREAT YARMOUTH SCHOOLS' MUSIC ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 1156414

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VALERIE SUSAN MILLER | Chair | 30 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Karen Elizabeth Hollowell | Trustee | 23 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Batley | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Carter | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANET JOAN RUST | Trustee | 11 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carol Judith Clayton | Trustee | 22 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL MARY SALTON | Trustee | 30 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.