Accounts and annual returns HALFORD VILLAGE HUT

Charity Number: 504012
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 March 2024 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 07 March 2024 36 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required