Financial history HALFORD VILLAGE HUT

Charity number: 504012
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.59k £22.36k £20.33k £29.37k £15.62k
Total expenditure £4.15k £9.03k £14.23k £22.69k £43.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.69k £10.67k £4.00k N/A