Accounts and annual returns NORTH NORFOLK FIT TOGETHER

Charity number: 1155369
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 July 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 September 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 June 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 June 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 September 2018 On Time