Accounts and annual returns VICTORIOUS COMMUNITY ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1158279
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2021 366 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2021 366 days late
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 January 2020 364 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 January 2020 364 days late
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 May 2018 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 May 2018 93 days late