Financial history VICTORIOUS COMMUNITY ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1158279
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £13.62k £3.84k £3.87k £0 £0
Total expenditure £5.00k £8.85k £54 £3.82k £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A