Financial history GLOBAL GATHERING CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1157353
Charity reporting is up to date (26 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 10/03/2020 10/03/2021 10/03/2022 10/03/2023 10/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £2.64k £4.14k £7.72k £4.72k
Total expenditure £0 £5.76k £5.46k £9.09k £5.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A