Accounts and annual returns LEICESTERSHIRE FOSTER CARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 504636
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 16 September 2024 229 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 February 2023 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required